EP4390563 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A HAND OF A WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBUGNON, Dominique 1162 Saint-Prex / CH | 02 /
TORTORA, Pierpasquale 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
HUOT-MARCHAND, Sylvain 2743 Eschert / CH | 04 /
COURVOISIER, Raphaël 2035 Corcelles / CH | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23220049.3 | 22.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | EP20220215943 | 22.12.2022 Original published format: EP 22215943 | [2024/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390563 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/30, G04G17/02, G04C10/02, G04G9/00, G04G17/04, G04G19/10 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G04B19/30 (EP);
G04B19/32 (CN,KR,US);
G04B19/06 (CN);
G04B19/12 (CN);
G04B45/0015 (KR);
G04C10/02 (EP,CN,US);
G04G17/00 (EP);
G04G17/02 (EP,KR);
G04G17/04 (EP);
G04G19/00 (EP);
G04G19/10 (EP);
G04G21/00 (EP);
G04G21/02 (EP);
G04G21/04 (EP);
G04G9/0041 (EP,KR);
G04G9/0064 (EP);
G04G9/007 (EP);
G04G99/00 (EP);
G04R60/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINER UHRZEIGER | [2024/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A HAND OF A WATCH | [2024/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA POSITION D'UNE AIGUILLE D'UNE MONTRE | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2290478 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH]); | [YA]CH708752 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]); | [A]JP2017096805 (SEIKO INSTR INC) |