EP4357921 - AUTOMATIC SCALING OF MICROSERVICES APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPCHA, Jalandip Sunnyvale, 94087 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Tong Fremont, 94539 / US | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23220630.0 | 31.03.2017 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | US201615388014 | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US201615388014 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4357921 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4357921 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48, G06F9/50 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G06F9/4843 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (CN);
G06F9/28 (US);
G06F9/5061 (EP,US);
G06F9/5066 (US);
G06F9/5083 (US);
H04L41/5003 (CN);
H04L41/5019 (CN);
H04L67/10 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2024/17] | G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE SKALIERUNG VON MIKRODIENSTANWENDUNGEN | [2024/17] | English: | AUTOMATIC SCALING OF MICROSERVICES APPLICATIONS | [2024/17] | French: | MISE À L'ÉCHELLE AUTOMATIQUE D'APPLICATIONS DE MICROSERVICES | [2024/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17164285.3 / EP3340052 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012154177 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al); | [XI]US2013290972 (CHERKASOVA LUDMILA [US], et al); | [A]US2015378758 (DUGGAN MATTHEW [US], et al); |