EP4329370 - APPLICATION-FRIENDLY PROTOCOL DATA UNIT (PDU) SESSION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xu Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
DAO, Ngoc Dung Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23220690.4 | 05.01.2018 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | US201762442857P | 05.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762442857 P | US201762455368P | 06.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762455368 P | US201762459985P | 16.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762459985 P | US201762473274P | 17.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762473274 P | US201762477384P | 27.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762477384 P | US201762487960P | 20.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762487960 P | US201762491529P | 28.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762491529 P | US201762522040P | 19.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762522040 P | US201715832103 | 05.12.2017 Original published format: US201715832103 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4329370 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4329370 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W8/14, H04W4/60, H04W12/06, H04W4/14, H04W80/10, H04W36/12, H04W36/22 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W28/02 (RU,US);
H04W80/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/60 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W16/04 (US);
H04W4/50 (KR,US);
H04W60/04 (US);
H04W72/53 (CN,US);
H04W72/535 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W8/065 (US);
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04W36/142 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04W36/22 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04W8/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/09] | H04W36/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSFREUNDLICHES PROTOKOLLDATENEINHEIT (PDU) SITZUNGSMANAGEMENT | [2024/40] | English: | APPLICATION-FRIENDLY PROTOCOL DATA UNIT (PDU) SESSION MANAGEMENT | [2024/09] | French: | GESTION DE SESSION D'UNITÉ DE DONNÉES DE PROTOCOLE (PDU) CONVIVIALE POUR UNE APPLICATION | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/09] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SITZUNGSVERWALTUNG MIT ANWENDUNGSFREUNDLICHER PROTOKOLLDATENEINHEIT (PDU) | ||
Former [2024/09] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE SESSION D'UNITÉ DE DONNÉES DE PROTOCOLE (PDU) CONVIVIALE POUR UNE APPLICATION | Examination procedure | 29.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 07.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18735818.9 / EP3494718 | EP20190389.5 / EP3755012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016156479 (BAEK YOUNG-KYO [KR], et al) |