EP4257789 - ASSEMBLY OF A VEHICLE WITH AN OPERATING ELEMENT ARRANGED ON A VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 08.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Bamberg Berliner Ring 1 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENTHAL, Markus 96052 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
Konarski, Philipp 96103 Hallstadt / DE | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23401013.0 | 05.04.2023 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | DE202210203459 | 06.04.2022 Original published format: DE102022203459 | [2023/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257789 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/611, E05B81/00, E05F15/73, E05F15/75, H03K17/945 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
E05F15/611 (EP,US);
E05F15/73 (EP,CN);
E05F15/76 (US);
B60R25/01 (US);
B60R25/24 (US);
E05B81/04 (US);
E05B81/56 (US);
E05B81/76 (EP,CN);
E05B81/77 (EP,CN,US);
E05F15/75 (EP);
E05Y2201/234 (EP);
E05Y2201/68 (EP);
E05Y2400/3015 (EP);
E05Y2400/852 (EP);
E05Y2400/86 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/531 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUGRUPPE EINES FAHRZEUGS MIT EINEM AN EINER FAHRZEUGTÜR ANGEORDNETEN BEDIENELEMENT | [2023/41] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF A VEHICLE WITH AN OPERATING ELEMENT ARRANGED ON A VEHICLE DOOR | [2023/41] | French: | MODULE D'UN VÉHICULE AVEC UN ÉLÉMENT DE COMMANDE DISPOSÉ SUR UNE PORTE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 11.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102007051493 (RAFI GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [XI]US2013033362 (HOURNE XAVIER [FR]); | [XYI]DE102014107559 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]DE102016112129 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE102019112802 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) | by applicant | DE102019211717 | WO2021023893 |