Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4463154 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2023207795 CN202380017007 EP2023050641W EP22305029 EP23700789 IL31419724 JP2024541674 KR20247026770 US202418893339



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2025032474Global Dossier 30.01.2025A1
Priority number Date
US202418729018 15.07.2024
EP22305029 13.01.2022
US202418893339 23.09.2024
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20240135643Global Dossier 11.09.2024A
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2025503663Global Dossier 04.02.2025A
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL314197Global Dossier 01.09.2024A
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118900691Global Dossier 05.11.2024A
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2023207795Global Dossier 01.08.2024A1
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4463154Global Dossier 20.11.2024A1
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2024008504 19.07.2024A
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
WO2023EP50641 12.01.2023
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023135207Global Dossier 20.07.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4212156Global Dossier 19.07.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP22305029 13.01.2022