blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4508367

EP4508367 - TEMPERATURE-REGULATING MODULE AND HEADLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.01.2025
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.10.2023
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.03.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mercedes-Benz Group AG
Mercedesstraße 120
70372 Stuttgart / DE
[2025/08]
Inventor(s)01 / MUELLER, Axel
73614 Schorndorf / DE
02 / NELSON, Anton
72119 Ammerbuch / DE
03 / KAISER, Janik
78315 Radolfzell / DE
 [2025/08]
Representative(s)Eschbach, Arnold
Mercedes-Benz Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG
KG 063-H512
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[2025/08]
Application number, filing date23710975.609.03.2023
[2025/08]
WO2023EP56071
Priority number, dateDE2022100124012.04.2022         Original published format: DE102022001240
[2025/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023198372
Date:19.10.2023
Language:DE
[2023/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4508367
Date:19.02.2025
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2025/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:F21S45/20, F21S45/33, F21S45/435, F21S45/60
[2025/08]
CPC:
F21S45/20 (EP,KR); F21S45/435 (EP,KR); F21S45/33 (EP,KR);
F21S45/60 (EP,KR); F21V29/54 (KR); F21V29/67 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2025/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEMPERIERUNGSMODUL UND SCHEINWERFER[2025/08]
English:TEMPERATURE-REGULATING MODULE AND HEADLIGHT[2025/08]
French:MODULE DE RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE ET PHARE[2025/08]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2024National basic fee paid 
20.09.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2024Examination requested  [2025/08]
20.09.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2025Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP2020569  (ODELO GMBH [DE]);
 [Y]DE102011089945  (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]);
 [Y]KR20140060828  (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]);
 [XY]FR3058503  (VALEO VISION [FR]);
 [X]WO2019156088  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP])
by applicantDE102007057056
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.