Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4505394 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202380044750 EP2023057118W EP23713086 KR20247036706



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20240171140Global Dossier 06.12.2024A
Priority number Date
EP22305441 04.04.2022
WO2023EP57118 21.03.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN119325710Global Dossier 17.01.2025A
Priority number Date
EP22305441 04.04.2022
WO2023EP57118 21.03.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4505394Global Dossier 12.02.2025A1
Priority number Date
EP22305441 04.04.2022
WO2023EP57118 21.03.2023
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023194089Global Dossier 12.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP22305441 04.04.2022