blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4496473

EP4496473 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.12.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.09.2023
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.04.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2025Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[2025/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BURKE, Roderick, Justin
Cambridgeshire CB21 5XE / GB
 [2025/05]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[2025/05]
Application number, filing date23713381.423.03.2023
[2025/05]
WO2023EP57558
Priority number, dateEP2022016375523.03.2022         Original published format: EP 22163755
[2025/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023180482
Date:28.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4496473
Date:29.01.2025
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2025/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2023
ClassificationIPC:A01N43/56, A01N63/12, A01P7/02
[2025/05]
CPC:
A01P7/04 (EP,KR); A01N43/56 (EP,KR); A01N63/12 (EP,KR)
C-Set:
A01N43/56, A01N25/04, A01N63/12 (EP);
A01N63/12, A01N25/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2025/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON INSEKTEN[2025/05]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING INSECTS[2025/05]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE LUTTE CONTRE LES INSECTES[2025/05]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2024National basic fee paid 
23.10.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2024Examination requested  [2025/05]
23.10.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2025Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantWO2020053603
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.