blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4377663

EP4377663 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING A FUNCTIONAL DIAGNOSIS OF AT LEAST ONE VEHICLE COMPONENT AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.10.2023
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.04.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mercedes-Benz Group AG
Mercedesstraße 120
70372 Stuttgart / DE
[2024/23]
Inventor(s)01 / KÖNIG, Simone
73486 Adelmannsfelden / DE
02 / KOPP, Oliver
71069 Sindelfingen / DE
03 / HAHN, Michael
73760 Ostfildern / DE
04 / STURM, Rose
71116 Gärtringen / DE
 [2024/23]
Representative(s)Buchta, Hao
Mercedes-Benz Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG
063 H512
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[2024/23]
Application number, filing date23714670.923.03.2023
[2024/23]
WO2023EP57400
Priority number, dateDE2022100125412.04.2022         Original published format: DE102022001254
[2024/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023198421
Date:19.10.2023
Language:DE
[2023/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4377663
Date:05.06.2024
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:G01M17/007, G07C5/08, G05B19/418
[2024/23]
CPC:
G01M17/007 (EP,KR); B60L3/12 (EP,KR); G07C5/0808 (EP,KR);
B60L2270/40 (EP,KR); G07C2205/02 (EP,KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER FUNKTIONSDIAGNOSE ZUMINDEST EINER FAHRZEUGKOMPONENTE UND DIAGNOSESYSTEM[2024/23]
English:METHOD FOR PERFORMING A FUNCTIONAL DIAGNOSIS OF AT LEAST ONE VEHICLE COMPONENT AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM[2024/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR EFFECTUER UN DIAGNOSTIC FONCTIONNEL D'AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT DE VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC[2024/23]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2024National basic fee paid 
27.02.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2024Examination requested  [2024/23]
27.02.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0793086  (SCHENCK KOMEG GMBH [DE]);
 [I]US2002133273  (LOWREY LARKIN HILL [US], et al);
 [I]US2009276115  (CHEN IEON C [US]);
 [AD]DE102009033806  (PORSCHE AG [DE]);
 [I]DE102015012524  (DAIMLER AG [DE]);
 [AD]DE102018203067  (AUDI AG [DE])
by applicantDE102009033806
 DE102012110623
 DE102013014878
 DE102018203067
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.