blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4515413

EP4515413 - COORDINATED SNAPSHOTS AMONG STORAGE SYSTEMS IMPLEMENTING A PROMOTION/DEMOTION MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.01.2025
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.11.2023
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.04.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pure Storage, Inc.
650 Castro Street
Suite 400
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
[2025/10]
Inventor(s)01 / KARR, Ronald
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
 [2025/10]
Representative(s)FRKelly
Waterways House
Grand Canal Quay
Dublin D02 PD39 / IE
[2025/10]
Application number, filing date23716040.316.03.2023
[2025/10]
WO2023US15380
Priority number, dateUS20221773094127.04.2022         Original published format: US202217730941
[2025/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023211578
Date:02.11.2023
Language:EN
[2023/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4515413
Date:05.03.2025
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2025/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.11.2023
ClassificationIPC:G06F16/182
[2025/10]
CPC:
G06F16/184 (EP,IL)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2025/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOORDINIERTE SCHNAPPSCHÜSSE ZWISCHEN SPEICHERSYSTEMEN MIT EINEM FÖRDERUNGS-/DEMOTIONSMODELL[2025/10]
English:COORDINATED SNAPSHOTS AMONG STORAGE SYSTEMS IMPLEMENTING A PROMOTION/DEMOTION MODEL[2025/10]
French:INSTANTANÉS COORDONNÉS PARMI DES SYSTÈMES DE STOCKAGE IMPLÉMENTANT UN MODÈLE DE PROMOTION/DÉMOTION[2025/10]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2024National basic fee paid 
18.11.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2024Examination requested  [2025/10]
18.11.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012303581  (CALDER BRADLEY GENE [US], et al);
 [I]US2021303164  (GRUNWALD DAVID [US], et al);
 [XI]WO2022076856  (PURE STORAGE INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.