EP4347965 - ENERGY ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.03.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Djukic-Schröder, Daliborka Kusenweg 8 33719 Bielefeld / DE | For all designated states Steppeler, Ralf Letter Straße 34 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Kanonegraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 23731701.1 | 13.06.2023 | [2024/15] | WO2023EP65768 | Priority number, date | DE202210121338 | 23.08.2022 Original published format: DE102022121338 | DE202210122131 | 01.09.2022 Original published format: DE102022122131 | [2024/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024041770 | Date: | 29.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347965 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.2024 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4347965 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/348, E04H1/12, E04H5/04 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
E04H1/1238 (EP,US);
E04B1/34869 (EP,US);
E04B1/34823 (EP,US);
E04H5/04 (EP,US);
E04B2001/34892 (US);
E04B2103/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIERAUM | [2024/15] | English: | ENERGY ROOM | [2024/15] | French: | SALLE D'ENERGIE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 24.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US5778608 (ELLIOTT JR THOMAS P [US]); | [IA]US5865346 (DEL ZOTTO WILLIAM M [US]); | [XAI]DE202006007580U (ERMO INDUSTRIEMONTAGEN REUNER [DE]); | [IA]DE202014009016U (HWR SYSTEM GMBH [DE]); | [IA]KR102176296B (NRB INC [KR]) | by applicant | DE102014007672 |