EP4301695 - TAIL GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A SULFURIC ACID PRODUCTION PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | 08.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemetics Inc. Nr. 200 - 2930 Virtual Way Vancouver, British Columbia V5M 0A5 / CA | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIJKSTRA, Rene North Vancouver British Columbia V7K2G4 / CA | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23731927.2 | 17.05.2023 | [2024/02] | WO2023CA50677 | Priority number, date | US202263346579P | 27.05.2022 Original published format: US 202263346579 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023225742 | Date: | 30.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301695 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/80, B01D53/14, C01B17/74 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C01B17/74 (EP);
B01D53/507 (EP);
C01B17/80 (EP);
B01D2251/102 (EP);
B01D2251/506 (EP);
B01D2252/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 27.06.2023 | MD | Not yet paid | TN | 27.06.2023 | Title | German: | RESTGASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE SCHWEFELSÄUREPRODUKTIONSANLAGE | [2024/02] | English: | TAIL GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A SULFURIC ACID PRODUCTION PLANT | [2024/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ RÉSIDUAIRE POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE SULFURIQUE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3853502 (DORR K, et al) [A] 1-12 *whole document*; | [A]CA1099484 (BAYER AG, et al) [A] 1-12 *whole document*; | [A]US4576813 (MCALISTER DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 *whole document*; | [YA]US5194239 (MASSELING JACOBUS J H [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6-12 *whole document* [A] 5; | [A]US2013336876 (SRINIVAS GIRISH [US], et al) [A] 1-12*whole document*; | [A]US8916127 (CHIU HSIEN-PING [TW], et al) [A] 1-12 *whole document*; | [A]CA3021202 (CHEMETICS INC [CA]) [A] 1-12 *whole document*; | [YA]CA3141027 (CHEMETICS INC [CA]) [Y] 1-4, 6-12 *whole document* [A] 5 |