EP4287325 - BINDER COMPOSITION FOR MANUFACTURING LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY CATHODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY CATHODE MANUFACTURED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | 03.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Unho Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Choonghyeon Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23743454.3 | 18.01.2023 | [2023/49] | WO2023KR00851 | Priority number, date | KR20220008331 | 20.01.2022 Original published format: KR 20220008331 | KR20230006616 | 17.01.2023 Original published format: KR 20230006616 | [2023/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023140607 | Date: | 27.07.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287325 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M4/04, H01M4/36, H01M10/052, H01M4/02 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H01M4/622 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (US);
H01M10/36 (EP);
H01M4/38 (EP);
H01M4/5815 (EP,US);
H01M4/623 (EP);
H01M4/64 (US);
H01M2004/028 (EP);
H01M2004/8689 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEKATHODE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEKATHODE | [2023/49] | English: | BINDER COMPOSITION FOR MANUFACTURING LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY CATHODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY CATHODE MANUFACTURED THEREBY | [2023/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIANT POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE CATHODE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, ET CATHODE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM AINSI FABRIQUÉE | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2023 | Translation filed | 28.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN105470518 (QINGDAO NENGXUN NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al); | [A]KR20160142823 (HERCULES LLC [US]); | [A]KR20200036177 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20210015499 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | by applicant | KR20020092029 | KR20220008331 | KR20230006616 |