Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4536684 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202380056975 EP23744305 US2023068376W US202318334309



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12180307Global Dossier 31.12.2024B2
US2023399362 14.12.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202318334309 13.06.2023
US202263351712 13.06.2022
US202263418715 24.10.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN119630685Global Dossier 14.03.2025A
Priority number Date
WO2023US68376 13.06.2023
US202263351712 13.06.2022
US202263418715 24.10.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4536684Global Dossier 16.04.2025A1
Priority number Date
WO2023US68376 13.06.2023
US202263351712 13.06.2022
US202263418715 24.10.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023245016Global Dossier 21.12.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202263351712 13.06.2022
US202263418715 24.10.2022