blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news
blank News flashes
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4475777

EP4475777 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CMC SUTURE SUSPENSIONPLASTY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.11.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2025Change: Validation statespublished on 14.05.2025 [2025/20]
11.04.2025Change - extension statespublished on 14.05.2025 [2025/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExsoMed Corporation
135 Columbia, Suite 201
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US
[2024/51]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAMPAGNE, Lloyd P.
Aliso Viejo, California 92565 / US
02 / EHMKE, Larry
Aliso Viejo, California 92565 / US
 [2024/51]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Application number, filing date23750276.007.02.2023
[2024/51]
WO2023US12518
Priority number, dateUS202263267655P07.02.2022         Original published format: US 202263267655 P
[2024/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023150386
Date:10.08.2023
Language:EN
[2023/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4475777
Date:18.12.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.08.2023
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/56, A61B17/68, A61B17/82, A61F2/30, A61F2/42
[2024/51]
CPC:
A61B17/0401 (EP,US); A61F2/0811 (US); A61B2017/0404 (EP,US);
A61B2017/044 (EP); A61B2017/0445 (US); A61B2017/0458 (EP); (+)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/51]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR CMC-NAHTSUSPENSIONSPLASTIE[2024/51]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CMC SUTURE SUSPENSIONPLASTY[2024/51]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SUSPENSION DE SUTURE CMC[2024/51]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2024National basic fee paid 
01.08.2024Search fee paid 
01.08.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2024Examination requested  [2024/51]
12.03.2025Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US6017366  (BERMAN ANDREW B [US]);
 [YA]US2011054627  (BEAR BRIAN J [US]);
 [YA]US2013053897  (BROWN MICHAEL G [US], et al);
 [A]US2015005891  (SHAPIRO PAUL S [US]);
 [A]US8961575  (CHOINSKI RONALD J [US]);
 [Y]US9119613  (GANNOE JAMY [US], et al);
 [Y]US9707090  (DELSIGNORE JEANNE L [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.