EP4330985 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THERMAL CAPACITY PREDICTION OF MEDICAL IMAGING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai United Imaging Healthcare Co., Ltd. IP Dept. HQ No.2258 Chengbei Rd. Jiading Industrial District Shanghai 201807 / CN | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Jie Shanghai 201807 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23766154.1 | 10.03.2023 | [2024/10] | WO2023CN80948 | Priority number, date | CN202210242007 | 11.03.2022 Original published format: CN202210242007 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023169577 | Date: | 14.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4330985 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.09.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/40, A61B6/40, A61B6/03, A61B6/58, G06N3/08, G06N20/20, G16H30/20, G16H40/67 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
A61B6/40 (EP);
G16H40/40 (EP,CN);
A61B6/032 (EP,CN);
A61B6/58 (EP,CN);
G06N20/00 (CN);
G06N20/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | G16H40/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VORHERSAGE DER WÄRMEKAPAZITÄT VON MEDIZINISCHEN BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/10] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THERMAL CAPACITY PREDICTION OF MEDICAL IMAGING DEVICES | [2024/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PRÉDICTION DE CAPACITÉ THERMIQUE DE DISPOSITIFS D'IMAGERIE MÉDICALE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN106874662 (SHENYANG NEUSOFT MEDICAL SYS); | [A]US2021045706 (THIBAULT JEAN-BAPTISTE [US], et al); | [A]CN113456099 (NEUSOFT MEDICAL SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [PX]CN114596951 (SHANGHAI COMBINED SHADOW MEDICAL SCIENCE AND TECH CO COMPANY LTD) |