EP4493900 - PLANT STALK STRENGTH MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2024 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Crop Protection AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2025/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAIR, Soumitra Downers Grove, Illinois 60515 / US | 02 /
LIU, Miao Downers Grove, Illinois 60515 / US | 03 /
TRAGESSER, Scott Monroeville, Indiana 46773 / US | 04 /
OLIVEIRA, Joao 38405-232 Minas Gerais / BR | [2025/04] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2025/04] | Application number, filing date | 23771280.7 | 13.03.2023 | [2025/04] | WO2023US15085 | Priority number, date | US202263321346P | 18.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263321346 P | [2025/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023177610 | Date: | 21.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4493900 | Date: | 22.01.2025 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2025/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01M5/00, A01G7/00, G01N3/20, G01N33/00 | [2025/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/0098 (EP);
A01D75/00 (EP);
A01G22/20 (EP);
G01L5/0071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2025/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER PFLÜCKSTÄRKE VON PFLANZEN | [2025/04] | English: | PLANT STALK STRENGTH MEASURING DEVICE | [2025/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE VIGUEUR DE TIGE DE PLANTE | [2025/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2024 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2024 | Examination requested [2025/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2025 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015149090 (MARQUEZ FEDERICO T [US], et al); | [A]US2018195929 (COOK DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [X]CN207991608U (DRY LAND FARMING INST OF HEBEI ACADEMY AGRICULTURAL & FORESTRY SCIENCES); | [A]US2021337734 (JEANTY CEDRIC [US], et al) |