Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4480616


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2025 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.11.2024 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.12.2024  [2024/52]
22.11.2024 Request for examination filed published on  25.12.2024  [2024/52]
23.09.2024 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2024 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2024 Change - representative
19.09.2024 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2023 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2023 New entry: applicant or inventor