Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.03.2025 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.01.2025 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.02.2025 [2025/06] |
03.01.2025 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.02.2025 [2025/06] |
10.12.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.09.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.09.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.09.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.09.2024 | Change - representative | |
13.09.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.10.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |