Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4505671 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4505671



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(21)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 493
17.01.2025 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
15.01.2025 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.01.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.01.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.01.2025 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.12.2024 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
04.12.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.2024 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
15.11.2024 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
06.11.2024 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 2
30.10.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.10.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.10.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
30.10.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
30.10.2024 Annex Search / examination 110
30.10.2024 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.10.2024 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
23.10.2023 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 150
05.10.2023 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2023 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 192