blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4512405

EP4512405 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING ACETYLSALICYLIC ACID AND PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.01.2025
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.10.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2025Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hanmi Pharm. Co., Ltd.
214 Muha-ro
Paltan-myeon
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18536 / KR
[2025/09]
Inventor(s)01 / TAK, Jin Wook
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18536 / KR
02 / HAM, Gun Joo
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18536 / KR
03 / KWON, Taek Kwan
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18536 / KR
04 / KIM, Yong Il
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18536 / KR
 [2025/09]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2025/09]
Application number, filing date23791981.627.01.2023
[2025/09]
WO2023KR01227
Priority number, dateKR2022004794719.04.2022         Original published format: KR 20220047947
KR2022008894319.07.2022         Original published format: KR 20220088943
[2025/09]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023204397
Date:26.10.2023
Language:KO
[2023/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4512405
Date:26.02.2025
Language:EN
[2025/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/616, A61K31/4439, A61K9/48, A61K9/50, A61K9/28, A61K45/06, A61P9/00, A61P9/10
[2025/09]
CPC:
A61P9/00 (EP); A61K31/4439 (EP); A61K31/616 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP); A61K9/2866 (EP); A61K9/2886 (EP);
A61K9/4808 (EP); A61K9/5026 (EP); A61K9/5042 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2025/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ACETYLSALICYLSÄURE UND PROTONENPUMPENHEMMER[2025/09]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING ACETYLSALICYLIC ACID AND PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR[2025/09]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT DE L'ACIDE ACÉTYLSALICYLIQUE ET UN INHIBITEUR DE LA POMPE À PROTONS[2025/09]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2024Translation filed 
26.09.2024National basic fee paid 
26.09.2024Search fee paid 
26.09.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2024Examination requested  [2025/09]
24.04.2025Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2005145894  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [XY]KR20080070841  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]);
 [Y]KR101193493B  ;
 [X]KR20140096157  (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]);
 [X]US2016089338  (KAWANO TETSUYA [JP], et al)
by applicantKR101908748B
 KR101952478B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.