EP4365495 - FILTERING DEVICE AND COMBINED STOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuhu Midea Smart Kitchen Appliance Manufacturing Co., Ltd. West side, 3/F, No. 5 Office Building New Energy and New Materials Cluster Fuzhou Road Jiangbei Concentration District Wuhu, Anhui 241000 / CN | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Yihua Wuhu, Anhui 241000 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Wangao Wuhu, Anhui 241000 / CN | 03 /
OUYANG, Weiming Wuhu, Anhui 241000 / CN | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 23797625.3 | 04.01.2023 | [2024/19] | WO2023CN70497 | Priority number, date | CN202211129680 | 16.09.2022 Original published format: CN202211129680 | [2024/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024055488 | Date: | 21.03.2024 | Language: | ZH | [2024/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4365495 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2024 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20, B01D46/12, B01D46/42, B01D46/00 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
B01D46/12 (EP);
B01D46/0002 (EP);
B01D46/4227 (EP);
F24C15/2035 (EP);
F24C15/2042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/19] | F24C15/20, B01D46/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERVORRICHTUNG UND KOMBINIERTER OFEN | [2024/19] | English: | FILTERING DEVICE AND COMBINED STOVE | [2024/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION ET POÊLE COMBINÉ | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2023 | Translation filed | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN210871041U (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA ELECTRICAL HEATING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD); | [XY]CN112594752 (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA WASHING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD); | [Y]CN213370445U (ZHEJIANG SUPOR ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD); | [A]CN214949269U (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA ELECTRICAL HEATING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD) |