EP4351150 - VIDEO PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Zitiao Network Technology Co., Ltd. 0207, 2/F, Building 4 Zijin Digital Park Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Jiayi Beijing 100028 / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 23817646.5 | 01.08.2023 | [2024/15] | WO2023CN110498 | Priority number, date | CN202210915150 | 01.08.2022 Original published format: CN202210915150 | [2024/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024027688 | Date: | 08.02.2024 | Language: | ZH | [2024/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351150 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/431 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N5/262 (CN);
H04N21/4318 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP);
G11B27/34 (EP);
H04N5/2621 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/15] | English: | VIDEO PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT VIDÉO, ET DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2023 | Translation filed | 13.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |