EP4325548 - SILICON COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR DEPOSITING FILMS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Versum Materials US, LLC 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284-2601 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Manchao Tempe, 85284 / US | 02 /
VIRTIS, Raymond Nicholas Tempe, 85284 / US | 03 /
RIDGEWAY, Robert Gordon Tempe, 85284 / US | 04 /
ENTLEY, William Robert Tempe, 85284 / US | 05 /
ACHTYL, Jennifer Lynn Anne Tempe, 85284 / US | 06 /
LEI, Xinjian Tempe, 85284 / US | 07 /
SPENCE, Daniel P. Tempe, 85284 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 24150603.9 | 09.08.2019 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US201862717454P | 10.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862717454 P | US201916532657 | 06.08.2019 Original published format: US201916532657 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4325548 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4325548 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, C23C16/48, C23C16/50, C23C16/56, C23C16/32, H01L21/02 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C23C16/401 (EP,CN);
C07F7/1804 (CN);
C07F7/1876 (CN);
C23C16/30 (CN);
C23C16/325 (EP);
C23C16/482 (EP);
C23C16/487 (EP);
C23C16/50 (EP,CN);
C23C16/56 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | H01L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | SILICIUMVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABLAGERUNG VON FILMEN DAMIT | [2024/08] | English: | SILICON COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR DEPOSITING FILMS USING SAME | [2024/08] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE SILICIUM ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉPÔT DE FILMS LES UTILISANT | [2024/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19791163.9 | EP21164681.5 / EP3872223 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002072220 (WANG QING MIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0026] * [Y] 3,4,10,11,14; | [Y]US2015364321 (VRTIS RAYMOND NICHOLAS [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0 40] , [0 63] *; | [A] - SHCHEPIN R ET AL, "B(C6F5)3-promoted tandem silylation and intramolecular hydrosilylation: diastereoselective synthesis of oxasilinanes and oxasilepanes", ORGANIC LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 12, no. 21, doi:10.1021/OL1018757, ISSN 1523-7060, (20101105), pages 4772 - 4775, (20101004), XP002713191 [A] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol1018757 | by applicant | US6132814 | US6204201 | US6207555 | US6583049 | - CHATTOPADHYAY et al., Journal of Materials Science, (20010000), vol. 36, pages 4323 - 4330 | - G. KLOSTER et al., Proceedings of IITC, (20020000), pages 3 - 5 |