EP4397568 - SINGLE-OPERATOR MULTI-FUNCTION FOLDABLE TRANSPORTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panosian, Michael H. 27 Prairie Irvine, CA 92618 / US | For all designated states Keeler, Joshua M. 35 Prairie Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 24150652.6 | 08.01.2024 | [2024/28] | Priority number, date | US202363437700P | 08.01.2023 Original published format: US 202363437700 P | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 Original published format: US202418404952 | US202418405501 | 05.01.2024 Original published format: US202418405501 | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397568 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/02, A61G3/02, B62B5/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B62B3/02 (EP);
B62B3/022 (US);
A61G1/0212 (EP);
A61G1/0237 (EP);
A61G1/04 (EP);
A61G1/0562 (EP);
A61G1/06 (EP);
A61G3/0272 (EP);
B25H1/04 (EP);
B25H1/16 (EP);
B62B5/0003 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
A61G2203/30 (EP);
B23D47/02 (EP);
B27B5/07 (EP);
B62B2202/12 (EP);
B62B2205/003 (EP);
B62B2205/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FALTBARER MULTIFUNKTIONSTRANSPORTER FÜR EINZELBETREIBER | [2024/28] | English: | SINGLE-OPERATOR MULTI-FUNCTION FOLDABLE TRANSPORTER | [2024/28] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR PLIABLE MULTIFONCTION À OPÉRATEUR UNIQUE | [2024/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1245212 (RTS CHAPUIS [FR]); | [XA]WO2004028432 (FERNO WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [X]WO2009089270 (FERNO WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [A]US2020223465 (GEFFEN YUVAL [IL]); | [XI]CN115300240 (SUINING CENTRAL HOSPITAL) | by applicant | US19520184049 |