Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024227894 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4397567 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118306458 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118306457 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202418405594 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118306456 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202418405556 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118306455 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202418405501 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024227896 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418405556 | 05.01.2024 | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024227895 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418405501 | 05.01.2024 | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024227892 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418405594 | 05.01.2024 | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4397570 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418405594 | 05.01.2024 | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4397569 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418405556 | 05.01.2024 | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4397568 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418405501 | 05.01.2024 | US202363437700 | 08.01.2023 | US202418404952 | 05.01.2024 |