EP4331826 - FOAMED ARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. Dutch Partnership One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Yihua Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
HANSON, Lyle R. Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 03 /
KHLYABICH, Petr Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 04 /
WATKINS, Richard L. Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 24151006.4 | 05.01.2022 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US202163263951P | 12.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163263951 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4331826 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4331826 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/34, C08J9/12, A43B13/00, B29C44/06, B29C44/24, B32B5/00, // B29K21/00, B29K23/00, B29K67/00, B29K75/00, B29K77/00, B29L31/00, B29L31/48, B29L31/50, B29L31/52 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
B29C44/3453 (EP);
A43D95/06 (US);
A43B1/14 (EP);
A43B13/04 (EP);
B29C44/06 (EP);
B29C44/065 (EP);
B29C44/24 (EP);
B29C44/348 (EP);
B29D35/122 (US);
B29D35/126 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
C08J9/122 (EP);
B29K2021/003 (EP);
B29K2023/00 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP);
B29K2621/003 (US);
B29L2031/00 (EP);
B29L2031/48 (EP);
B29L2031/50 (EP);
B29L2031/52 (EP);
C08J2201/032 (EP);
C08J2203/06 (EP);
C08J2300/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | B29L31/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHÄUMTE ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2024/10] | English: | FOAMED ARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2024/10] | French: | ARTICLES EN MOUSSE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2024/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22701461.0 / EP4225553 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0018557 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA]) [Y] 2* page 11, line 25 - line 28 *; | [XY]EP1008637 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0 16] , [0 21] , [0025] , [0 26] * [Y] 2,3,7-13; | [XY]US2013324629 (KANADA MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,13 * paragraph [0131]; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 2,3,7-12; | [XY]US2014259329 (WATKINS RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,4-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 23] , [0 46] , [0 47] , [ 131]; figure 1; claim 8 * [Y] 2,3,11-13; | [XY]US2014275306 (WATKINS RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 51] * [Y] 2,3,7-11; | [XY]WO2018222968 (NIKE INNOVATE CV [US], et al) [X] 1,4-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0137] , [0140] , [0151] - [0154]; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,12,13; | [XY]EP3429386 (NIKE INNOVATE CV [US]) [X] 1,4-6,14,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0024]; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,11-13 |