Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4336804 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4336804



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 433
12.12.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.12.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.12.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.12.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.12.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.12.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.12.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
12.12.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
12.12.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.06.2024 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
14.05.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.05.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 5
14.05.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
14.05.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
14.02.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.01.2024 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.01.2024 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.01.2024 Claims Search / examination 4
15.01.2024 Description Search / examination 144
15.01.2024 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
15.01.2024 Drawings Search / examination 71
15.01.2024 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
01.09.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153