EP4368864 - COMBINATION ISOLATION VALVE AND CHECK VALVE WITH INTEGRAL FLOW RATE, PRESSURE, AND/OR TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT WITH WIRELESS POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluid Handling LLC. 8200 N. Austin Avenue Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosca, Florin NILES, 60714 / US | 02 /
Pezzuolo, Andrea 45025 FRATTA POLESINE ROVIGO / IT | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 24152969.2 | 12.09.2016 | [2024/20] | Priority number, date | US201562217355P | 11.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562217355 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4368864 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4368864 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, F16K31/02, F16K37/00, F16K15/18 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
F16K37/0075 (EP,RU,US);
F16K15/18 (EP,RU,US);
F24F5/0003 (US);
F16K17/003 (RU,US);
F16K37/0025 (EP,US);
F16K37/0091 (RU,US);
F24F5/00 (RU);
G01F15/14 (RU,US);
G01K1/08 (RU,US);
G01L19/14 (RU,US);
H02J50/20 (RU,US);
H02M7/02 (RU,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,US);
F24F2140/12 (EP,US);
F24F2140/20 (EP,US);
H04B5/79 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/20] | F16K37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTES TRENN- UND RÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTER DURCHFLUSSRATEN-, DRUCK- UND/ODER TEMPERATURMESSUNG MIT DRAHTLOSER LEISTUNG | [2024/20] | English: | COMBINATION ISOLATION VALVE AND CHECK VALVE WITH INTEGRAL FLOW RATE, PRESSURE, AND/OR TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT WITH WIRELESS POWER | [2024/20] | French: | COMBINAISON DE SOUPAPE D'ISOLEMENT ET DE CLAPET ANTI-RETOUR AVEC MESURE INTÉGRÉE DE DÉBIT, DE PRESSION ET/OU DE TEMPÉRATURE AVEC UNE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2024/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16845255.5 / EP3347998 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007021140 (KEYES MARION A IV [US], et al); | [A]US2010181067 (CHEN KUO-CHIANG [US], et al); | [A]WO2012034857 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [Y]US2013060496 (NARITA HIROAKI [JP]); | [A]US2013239673 (GARCIA-OSUNA FERNANDO [US], et al); | [A]US2014111347 (SLAPAL MIROSLAV [CZ], et al); | [A]WO2014077849 (FLOWSERVE MAN CO [US]); | [Y]US2014360604 (ROSCA FLORIN [US], et al) | by applicant | US8461817 | US9366582 |