Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023145603 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318092902 | 03.01.2023 | US201615226054 | 02.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3479375 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP3479375 | 08.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US42768 | 19.07.2017 | US201615226054 | 02.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4332961 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | A3 | EP4332961 | 06.03.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP17745607 | 19.07.2017 | WO2017US42768 | 19.07.2017 | US201615226054 | 02.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018026520 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615226054 | 02.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018039478 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615226054 | 02.08.2016 | Type | Earlier application | EP3479375 |