EP4332961 - VOICE INTERACTION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOOGLE LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View CA 94043 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNG, Sang Soo Mountain View, 94043 / US | 02 /
ZHENG, Lantian Mountain View, 94043 / US | 03 /
WHIPP, David P Mountain View, CA / US | 04 /
SUN, Liuyi Mountain View, 94043 / US | 05 /
CHAN, Haywai Hayward Mountain View / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | Shipp, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 24152994.0 | 19.07.2017 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US201615226054 | 02.08.2016 Original published format: US201615226054 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4332961 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4332961 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22, G06F3/16, // G10L15/30 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G10L15/1822 (US);
G10L15/22 (EP,US);
G10L15/30 (EP,US);
G10L2015/223 (EP,US);
G10L2015/225 (US);
G10L2015/228 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | G10L15/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | SPRACHINTERAKTIONSDIENSTE | [2024/10] | English: | VOICE INTERACTION SERVICES | [2024/10] | French: | SERVICES D'INTERACTION VOCALE | [2024/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17745607.6 / EP3479375 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010141802 (APPLE INC [US], et al); | [A]US2014278436 (KHANNA RAHUL [US], et al); | [A]US9400633 (REICH DAVID E [US], et al) |