EP4372447 - DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING DYNAMIC PROJECTION PATTERNS IN A CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 W. Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tewes, Michael 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Özer, Alpdeniz Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Corporate Legal Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 24153197.9 | 07.06.2019 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | US201816003592 | 08.06.2018 Original published format: US201816003592 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4372447 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4372447 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00, G01B11/25, H01S5/40, G02B3/00, G02B19/00 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A61C9/006 (EP);
G01B11/2513 (EP,KR);
H04N13/254 (KR,US);
G01B11/25 (EP);
G02B19/0014 (KR,US);
G02B19/0066 (KR,US);
G02B27/30 (KR,US);
G02B3/005 (EP);
G02B3/0056 (KR,US);
G02B3/0068 (EP,KR);
G02B5/201 (KR,US);
G06T7/521 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/21] | G02B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG DYNAMISCHER PROJEKTIONSMUSTER IN EINER KAMERA | [2024/21] | English: | DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING DYNAMIC PROJECTION PATTERNS IN A CAMERA | [2024/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR GÉNÉRER DES MOTIFS DE PROJECTION DYNAMIQUE DANS UNE CAMÉRA | [2024/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19733328.9 / EP3801366 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016000332 (ATIYA YOSSEF [IL], et al); | [XI]US2016202051 (HEIST STEFAN [DE], et al); | [Y]DE102015209402 (SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3165874 (HEXAGON TECHNOLOGY CT GMBH [CH]); | [XI]DE102016000415 (DÜRR DENTAL AG [DE]) |