Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4371616 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4371616



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(26)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 573
17.03.2025 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
12.02.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.02.2025 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.09.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.08.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
30.07.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 3
30.07.2024 European search report Search / examination 3
30.07.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.07.2024 Search started Search / examination 1
24.04.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.04.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.04.2024 Claims Search / examination 3
03.04.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.04.2024 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.02.2024 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
29.01.2024 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.01.2024 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.01.2024 Annex Search / examination 3
29.01.2024 Description Search / examination 162
29.01.2024 Designation of inventor Search / examination 3
29.01.2024 Drawings Search / examination 37
29.01.2024 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
22.11.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 225
22.11.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 105