EP4338908 - DETECTION SYSTEMS FOR POWER TOOLS WITH ACTIVE INJURY MITIGATION TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SawStop Holding LLC 11555 SW Myslony Street Tualatin, OR 97062 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASS, Stephen, F. 97068 West Linn / US | 02 /
NENADIC, John, P. 98607 Camas / US | 03 /
SLAMKA, Louis, R. 98686 Vancouver / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 24154975.7 | 25.05.2017 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | US201662343451P | 31.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662343451 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4338908 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4338908 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/00, B23D45/00, H01R39/20, H01R39/64, B32B9/00, F16P3/12, B26D7/22, B23D47/12, B27G19/00, F16P3/14 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B27G19/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16P3/148 (EP,KR,US);
B23D47/12 (EP,KR,US);
B26D7/22 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/00 (EP,US);
F16P3/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | B27G19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSSYSTEME FÜR ELEKTROWERKZEUGE MIT AKTIVER VERLETZUNGSMINDERUNGSTECHNOLOGIE | [2024/12] | English: | DETECTION SYSTEMS FOR POWER TOOLS WITH ACTIVE INJURY MITIGATION TECHNOLOGY | [2024/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE DÉTECTION POUR OUTILS ÉLECTRIQUES AVEC TECHNOLOGIE D'ATTÉNUATION ACTIVE DES BLESSURES | [2024/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17807273.2 / EP3463772 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4468069 (MEAL JOHN R [US], et al); | [A]DE4221479 (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]); | [XA]US8413559 (GASS STEPHEN F [US]) | by applicant | US2002056349 | US2003015253 | US6813983 | US6826988 | US6857345 | US6877410 | US6880440 | US6945148 | US6945149 | US6957601 | US6994004 | US7000514 | US7024975 | US7077039 | US7098800 | US7100483 | US7137326 | US7171879 | US7197969 | US7210383 | US7225712 | US7231856 | US7284467 | US7347131 | US7350444 | US7350445 | US7359174 | US7377199 | US7600455 | US7610836 | US7621205 | US7661343 | US7698976 | US7707918 | US7712403 | US7784507 | US7836804 | US8490527 | US20080100211 |