EP4340289 - USER DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakishima, Yuichi Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Takada, Takuma Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Fujimura, Naoki Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Harada, Hiroki Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 24155270.2 | 10.05.2019 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4340289 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4340289 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/15, H04W16/28, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04L5/0057 (EP);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2024/12] | English: | USER DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2024/12] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19928807.7 / EP3968729 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015215929 (DAMNJANOVIC ALEKSANDAR [US], et al); |