Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP4386080

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Validation statesKH 
MA 
MD 
TN 
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.202407   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2024
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.06.2024 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:3775165
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:19.06.2024 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:17.05.2024 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:17.05.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED
 
Event date:28.08.2024 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Free Format Text:CASE NUMBER: APP_42731/2024
Effective DATE:20240719
 
Event date:20.09.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 40106685 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:01.11.2024 
Event description:SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C12M0003000000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N0005078300
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 5/0783 20100101AFI20241029BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01N 1/02 20060101ALI20241029BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 35/17 20150101ALI20241029BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12M 3/00 20060101ALI20241029BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR