EP4351225 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR ALLOWING TERMINAL TO MOVE BETWEEN 4G AND 5G NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Fei Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 02 /
LI, Zhendong Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Jinguo Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 24158827.6 | 16.01.2018 | [2024/15] | Priority number, date | CN201710166973 | 20.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710166973 | [2024/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4351225 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4351225 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W48/12 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04W36/00222 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/0033 (CN,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/12 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W80/10 (US);
H04W88/06 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2024/15] | H04W48/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DES BEWEGENS EINES ENDGERÄTS ZWISCHEN 4G- UND 5G-NETZWERKEN | [2024/15] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR ALLOWING TERMINAL TO MOVE BETWEEN 4G AND 5G NETWORKS | [2024/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT À UN TERMINAL DE SE DÉPLACER ENTRE DES RÉSEAUX 4G ET 5G | [2024/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18772060.2 / EP3606165 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3432641 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); |