Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11845947 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2023 | B2 | US2021137040 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | US202017123991 | 16.12.2020 | US201614916671 | 04.03.2016 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10897862 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2021 | B2 | US2016201080 | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3041345 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | B1 | EP3041345 | 13.07.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105705005B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2019 | B | CN105705005 | 22.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2923223 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2021 | C | CA2923223 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4353078 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | EP14761579 | 03.09.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR097555 | 23.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122022020300 | 21.11.2023 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | BR112016004699 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3127948 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2923223 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013014637 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3041345T | 08.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA036362 | 30.10.2020 | B1 | EA201690508 | 30.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12016500424 | 23.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12020551945 | 16.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3041345T | 22.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS65649 | 31.07.2024 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | EP14761579 | 03.09.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3041345T | 30.08.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02386 | 03.09.2014 | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | EP14761579 | 03.09.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015032494 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A3 | WO2015032494 | 12.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2016000487 | 23.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2018001957 | 31.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2018001958 | 31.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3041345T | 02.07.2024 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102014005823 | 24.04.2014 | DE102013014637 | 04.09.2013 | Type | Earlier application | EP3041345 |