Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017106127 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562242869 | 16.10.2015 | US201615295924 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12064545 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2024 | B2 | US2021196866 | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562242869 | 16.10.2015 | US201615295924 | 17.10.2016 | US202117141101 | 04.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3362112 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | C0 | EP3362112 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | B1 | EP3362112 | 22.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562242869 | 16.10.2015 | WO2016US57413 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3001861 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562242869 | 16.10.2015 | WO2016US57413 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4349379 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A3 | EP4349379 | 10.04.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP16788360 | 17.10.2016 | US201562242869 | 16.10.2015 | WO2016US57413 | 17.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017066798 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562242869 | 16.10.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3362112 |