EP4354450 - MANAGED MEDICAL INFORMATION EXCHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter Corporation Englewood 9540 South Maroon Circle, Suite 400 Englewood, CO 80112 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALENTINE, Matthew A. Madison, 06443 / US | 02 /
PADMANI, Bhavesh Hawthorn Woods, 60047 / US | 03 /
BOSSIO, Robert Palm Coast, 32164 / US | 04 /
YEVSEYEVA, Kristina Daytona Beach, 32118 / US | 05 /
MODEKURTI, Srinivas Buffalo Grove, 60089 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 24159814.3 | 29.06.2015 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | US201462019227P | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462019227 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4354450 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4354450 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/60, G16H70/20, G16H70/40, // G06Q50/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G16H70/20 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/16] | G16H20/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | VERWALTETER AUSTAUSCH MEDIZINISCHER INFORMATIONEN | [2024/16] | English: | MANAGED MEDICAL INFORMATION EXCHANGE | [2024/16] | French: | ÉCHANGE D'INFORMATIONS MÉDICALES GÉRÉES | [2024/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15815359.3 / EP3161778 | EP20203335.3 / EP3826028 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007192139 (COOKSON AMMON [US], et al); | [I]US2008046292 (MYERS SCOTT D [US], et al); | [I]EP1939785 (SURVEILLANCE DATA INC [US]); | [A]US2013304510 (CHEN JAMES F [US], et al) |