EP4353256 - INDUCTION OF CROSS-REACTIVE CELLULAR RESPONSE AGAINST RHINOVIRUS ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | For all designated states IP2IPO Innovations Limited 2nd Floor 3 Pancras Square King's Cross London N1C 4AG / GB | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLEAN, Gary London / GB | 02 /
ROSS, Walton Stratford upon Avon / GB | 03 /
JOHNSON, Sebastian London / GB | 04 /
BARTLETT, Nathan London / GB | 05 /
GUY, Bruno Lyon / FR | 06 /
GIRERD-CHAMBAZ, Yves Messimy / FR | 07 /
LECOUTURIER, Valerie Chazay d'Azergues / FR | 08 /
ALMOND, Jeffrey Dardilly / FR | 09 /
GLANVILLE, Nicholas London / GB | 10 /
BURDIN, Nicholas Saint Genis les Ollieres / FR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 24160236.6 | 06.02.2014 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | EP20130305152 | 07.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13305152 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4353256 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4353256 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/125, C07K14/005, C07K16/10, A61K39/145, A61K39/00 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
A61K39/125 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N9/127 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/16] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | INDUKTION DER KREUZREAKTIVEN ZELLREAKTION GEGEN RHINOVIRUS-ANTIGENE | [2024/16] | English: | INDUCTION OF CROSS-REACTIVE CELLULAR RESPONSE AGAINST RHINOVIRUS ANTIGENS | [2024/16] | French: | INDUCTION D'UNE RÉPONSE CELLULAIRE À RÉACTION CROISÉE CONTRE DES ANTIGÈNES DE RHINOVIRUS | [2024/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14703073.8 / EP2953966 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO2011050384 |