Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.06.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
01.03.2024 | Change - representative | |
01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |