Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017155884 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017155870 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017155848 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010141426 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024116025 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | WO2017US20954 | 06.03.2017 | US201816082823 | 06.09.2018 | US202318188182 | 22.03.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023294073 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US20907 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US202318311671 | 03.05.2023 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | US201816082803 | 06.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023041546 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816101779 | 13.08.2018 | US201313638924 | 14.02.2013 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | US202217946714 | 16.09.2022 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022203329 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217688367 | 07.03.2022 | US201113266166 | 17.11.2011 | WO2010US36835 | 01.06.2010 | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021237033 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US45252 | 25.07.2011 | US202117221376 | 02.04.2021 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | US201313639328 | 11.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019134604 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US20859 | 06.03.2017 | US201716082770 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019015815 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716082803 | 06.03.2017 | WO2017US20907 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013112605 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113639328 | 25.07.2011 | WO2011US45252 | 25.07.2011 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11642653 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2023 | B2 | US2019091657 | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716082823 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | WO2017US20954 | 06.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11478775 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2018353934 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816101779 | 13.08.2018 | US201313638924 | 14.02.2013 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11439977 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | B2 | US2017173561 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113266166 | 17.11.2011 | US201313638924 | 14.02.2013 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | WO2010US36835 | 01.06.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201715451005 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11291974 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2012055860 | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201013266166 | 01.06.2010 | WO2010US36835 | 01.06.2010 | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10092893 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2018 | B2 | US2013206665 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | US201113638924 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6364375B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2018 | B2 | JP2015163895 | 10.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6199184B | Global Dossier | 20.09.2017 | B2 | JP2013539016 | 17.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US45252 | 25.07.2011 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5856162B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013535544 | 12.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6151021B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B2 | JP2012529054 | 15.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US36835 | 01.06.2010 | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3964287 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US36835 | 01.06.2010 | EP10783904 | 01.06.2010 | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3834928 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2024 | B1 | EP3834928 | 16.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | EP11815053 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3834927 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US45252 | 25.07.2011 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | EP11815055 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3426390 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US20859 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3426389 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | WO2017US20954 | 06.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3426388 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US20907 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2598441 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP2598441 | 30.08.2017 | A4 | EP2598441 | 05.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US45252 | 25.07.2011 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2598440 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2020 | B1 | EP2598440 | 16.08.2017 | A4 | EP2598440 | 05.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2437882 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | A4 | EP2437882 | 11.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US36835 | 01.06.2010 | US18307509 | 01.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109414681 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | WO2017US20954 | 06.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109070053 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US20859 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109070050 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US20907 | 06.03.2017 | US201662304261 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304254 | 06.03.2016 | US201662304259 | 06.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4353682 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | A3 | EP4353682 | 17.04.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP20209731 | 25.07.2011 | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | WO2011US45246 | 25.07.2011 | EP11815053 | 25.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012018598 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012018596 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2012 | A3 | WO2012018596 | 09.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016104864 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US36779710 | 26.07.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2598440 | EP3834928 |