EP4358231 - BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya Kagacho 1-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI, Youichi Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHAGI, Atsuko Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Rikiya Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Miho Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 24160687.0 | 28.05.2019 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | JP20180101810 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018101810 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4358231 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4358231 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/14, H01M50/325, H01G11/78, H01M10/04, H01M10/52 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H01G11/20 (EP);
H01M50/317 (KR,US);
H01M50/202 (US);
H01G11/14 (US);
H01G11/18 (KR);
H01G11/78 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/80 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M50/103 (EP);
H01M50/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/121 (EP);
H01M50/124 (KR);
H01M50/129 (EP);
H01M50/184 (EP);
H01M50/186 (EP);
H01M50/193 (EP);
H01M50/231 (US);
H01M50/244 (US);
H01M50/333 (EP,KR);
H01M50/392 (EP);
H01M50/394 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/17] | H01M10/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BATTERIE | [2024/17] | English: | BATTERY | [2024/17] | French: | BATTERIE | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 25.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19811753.3 / EP3806185 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006092905 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2006179442 (NEC LAMILION ENERGY LTD); | [A]JP2008198664 (OPTNICS PREC CO LTD); | [A]US2009081542 (YAGETA HIROSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2010153841 | JP2016031934 |