EP4400503 - NOVEL FXR (NR1H4) BINDING AND ACTIVITY MODULATING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2024/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINZEL, Olaf 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
STEENECK, Christoph 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
KREMOSER, Claus 69121 Heidelberg / DE | [2024/29] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/29] | Application number, filing date | 24164624.9 | 12.07.2012 | [2024/29] | Priority number, date | EP20110005722 | 13.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11005722 | US201161507153P | 13.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161507153 P | [2024/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4400503 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4400503 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, C07D413/14, A61P1/16, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61K31/42, C07D261/08 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/435 (KR);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/29] | C07D413/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER FXR (NR1H4)-BINDUNG UND -AKTIVITÄT | [2024/29] | English: | NOVEL FXR (NR1H4) BINDING AND ACTIVITY MODULATING COMPOUNDS | [2024/29] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITÉ ET DE LIAISON FXR (NR1H4) | [2024/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12735100.5 / EP2731676 | EP15002478.4 / EP2987532 | EP17000383.4 / EP3246070 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO0037077 | WO03015771 | WO03080803 | WO2004048349 | WO2004087076 | WO2007076260 | WO2007092751 | WO2007140174 | WO2007140183 | WO2008025539 | WO2008025540 | WO2008051942 | WO2008157270 | WO2009005998 | WO2009012125 | WO2011020615 |