EP4365643 - OPTICAL GLASS, AND OPTICAL ELEMENT, CEMENTED LENS, OPTICAL SYSTEM, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS FOR CAMERA AND OPTICAL DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 22.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIDE, Tetsuya Tokyo, 108-6290 / JP | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 24165287.4 | 18.04.2018 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | JP20170208104 | 27.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017208104 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4365643 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4365643 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/21, C03C3/062, C03C3/064, C03C3/066, G02B1/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G02B1/002 (EP);
C03C3/21 (EP,CN,US);
C03C3/17 (US);
C03C3/062 (CN);
C03C3/064 (CN);
C03C3/066 (EP,CN);
C03C3/19 (US);
G02B1/00 (CN,US);
G02B3/0012 (EP);
G03B17/14 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/19] | G02B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/39] |
Former [2024/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHES GLAS UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT, ZEMENTIERTE LINSE, OPTISCHES SYSTEM, AUSTAUSCHBARE LINSE FÜR KAMERA UND OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/19] | English: | OPTICAL GLASS, AND OPTICAL ELEMENT, CEMENTED LENS, OPTICAL SYSTEM, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS FOR CAMERA AND OPTICAL DEVICE USING SAME | [2024/19] | French: | VERRE OPTIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE, LENTILLE CIMENTÉE, SYSTÈME OPTIQUE, LENTILLE INTERCHANGEABLE POUR CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2024/19] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18871384.6 / EP3702336 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2504515 (ESSILOR INT [FR]); | [XA]JPH0383836 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [A]JPH11139847 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO, et al) | by applicant | JP2006219365 | JP2017208104 |