EP4364680 - HIGH-DENSITY ELECTRODE CATHETERS WITH MAGNETIC POSITION TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Cardiology Division, Inc. 177 E. County Road B St. Paul MN 55117 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEGG, Troy T. Elk River, 55330 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Gregory K. Elk River, 55330 / US | 03 /
MARASS, Timothy S. Minneapolis, 55419 / US | 04 /
SUTERMEISTER, Derek C. Ham Lake, 55304 / US | 05 /
EBNER, Bruce Shorewood, 55331 / US | 06 /
CAO, Hong Savage, 55378 / US | 07 /
POPOV, Vladislav Dmidrievich Plymouth, 55441 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/19] | Alpspitz IP Longinusstraße 1 81247 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 24165325.2 | 18.08.2021 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | US202063067284P | 18.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063067284 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4364680 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4364680 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B90/00, // A61B18/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B90/06 (EP);
A61B90/50 (US);
A61B2018/0016 (US);
A61B2018/00267 (US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00357 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00636 (US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1465 (US);
A61B2018/1467 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (US);
A61B2034/2059 (US);
A61B2560/0462 (US);
A61B2562/0223 (US);
A61B34/25 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/19] | A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | HOCHDICHTE ELEKTRODENKATHETER MIT MAGNETISCHER POSITIONSVERFOLGUNG | [2024/19] | English: | HIGH-DENSITY ELECTRODE CATHETERS WITH MAGNETIC POSITION TRACKING | [2024/19] | French: | CATHÉTERS À ÉLECTRODES À HAUTE DENSITÉ À SUIVI DE POSITION MAGNÉTIQUE | [2024/19] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21762117.6 / EP4167886 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015342700 (GOVARI ASSAF [IL], et al); | [A]US2017319269 (OLIVERIUS ANDREW R [US], et al); | [A]US2018116539 (OLSON GREGORY K [US], et al); | [A]US2020229726 (STERRETT TERRY L [US], et al) | by applicant | US6233476 | US6498944 | US6690963 | US6788967 | US2007060833 | US7197354 | US7263397 | US7386339 | US8636718 | WO2014059709 | US2018296111 | US20050227580 | WO2014US11940 |