EP4371444 - TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Yanmei Jiangsu, 225111 / CN | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 24167215.3 | 14.09.2011 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4371444 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4371444 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A46B3/00 (US);
A46B9/028 (US);
A46D1/0276 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2024/21] | English: | TOOTHBRUSH | [2024/21] | French: | BROSSE À DENTS | [2024/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11872280.0 / EP2755524 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5533227 (ITO RYU [JP], et al) |