Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4375444 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4375444



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(24)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 164
12.02.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2025 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.02.2025 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.02.2025 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
12.02.2025 Summary of subsequently filed documents Search / examination 2
20.08.2024 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
22.07.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
17.07.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 6
17.07.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
17.07.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.06.2024 Search started Search / examination 1
02.05.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.04.2024 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.04.2024 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.04.2024 Claims Search / examination 3
08.04.2024 Description Search / examination 27
08.04.2024 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.04.2024 Drawings Search / examination 22
08.04.2024 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
21.01.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
21.01.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 9
27.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
27.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37