EP4376425 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SUPPLEMENTING MEDIA ASSETS DURING FAST-ACCESS PLAYBACK OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeia Guides Inc. 3025 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/22] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STATHACOPOULOS, Paul T. San Carlos, 94070 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 24169300.1 | 23.02.2015 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | US201414190235 | 26.02.2014 Original published format: US201414190235 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4376425 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4376425 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2387, H04N21/422, H04N21/43, H04N21/431, H04N21/81 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H04N21/47217 (EP,US);
H04N21/42201 (EP,US);
H04N21/42222 (EP,US);
H04N21/43074 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/6587 (EP,US);
H04N21/8106 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/22] | H04N21/81 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ERGÄNZUNG VON MEDIENANLAGEN WÄHREND SCHNELLZUGRIFFSWIEDERGABEOPERATIONEN | [2024/22] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SUPPLEMENTING MEDIA ASSETS DURING FAST-ACCESS PLAYBACK OPERATIONS | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR COMPLÉTER DES ACTIFS MULTIMÉDIAS DURANT DES OPÉRATIONS DE LECTURE À ACCÈS RAPIDE | [2024/22] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 12.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15709574.6 / EP3111650 | EP18185913.3 / EP3413574 | EP20175513.9 / EP3716633 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007250901 (MCINTIRE JOHN P [US], et al); | [A]US2009122079 (NISHIOKA YOSHIO [JP]); | [A]US2010083306 (DEMPSKI KELLY L [US], et al); | [A]US2010166389 (KNEE ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]WO2012154143 (ECHOSTAR UKRAINE LLC [UA], et al); | [A]US2013070152 (BERKOWITZ DANIEL [US], et al); | [A]US2013297706 (ARME JONATHAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2013166411 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US], et al); | [A]US2013339998 (ARME JONATHAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US6239794 | US6388714 | US2002174430 | US6564378 | US2003110499 | US6756997 | US2005251827 | US7165098 | US2010153885 | US2010166389 | US7761892 | US8046801 | US20050179410 |